THE YORKSHIRE (NORTH AND WEST) ARMY CADET FORCE CHARITABLE TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Make grants to young people (age 12 - 18 yrs) who are members of Yorkshire (N & W) army cadet force for education or training purposes. Grants may also be made to supply equipment or items which support the same aims.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Other Finance
- Bradford City
- Calderdale
- City Of Wakefield
- City Of York
- Kirklees
- Leeds City
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 28 June 1966: Standard registration
- 15 January 2025: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- ARMY CADET FORCE FOR YORKSHIRE (NORTH AND WEST) WELFARE FUND (Previous name)
- ARMY CADET FORCE OF THE WEST RIDING OF YORKSHIRE WELFARE FUND (Previous name)
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.13k | £2.69k | £5.73k | £46 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.73k | £4.22k | £4.13k | £1.18k | £1.28k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 118 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 118 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 484 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 484 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 07 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 03 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 02 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
(LETTER OF 30TH NOVEMBER, 1965) AND AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 17 NOVEMBER 2008
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CHARITY IS THE PROVISION AND SUPPORT OF TRAINING AND EDUCATION IN DUTIES OF GOOD CITIZENSHIP FOR YOUNG PERSONS IN THE YORKSHIRE (NORTH AND WEST) ARMY CADET FORCE AND HELPING SUCH YOUNG PERSONS THROUGH THEIR LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES TO DEVELOP THEIR PHYSICAL, MENTAL AND SPIRITUAL CAPACITY SO THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND GOOD CITIZENS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY AND THAT THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE MAY BE IMPROVED.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window