Financial history CHARITY OF THOMAS HORLEY

Charity number: 246049
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 01/01/2020 01/01/2021 01/01/2022 01/01/2023 01/01/2024
Total gross income £9 £18 £18 £36 £19
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A