Accounts and annual returns THE WESTFIELD HEALTH CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 246057
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2023 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 Not submitted
Annual return 05 April 2022 30 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 30 January 2023 On Time
Annual return 05 April 2021 01 February 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 01 February 2022 On Time
Annual return 06 April 2020 27 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 06 April 2020 27 January 2021 On Time
Annual return 06 April 2019 17 December 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 06 April 2019 17 December 2019 On Time