BILSBORROW (GALLOWAY) TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The relief of need of persons resident in the area of benefit who are sick, convalescent, disabled, handicapped or infirm.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Lancashire
Governance
- 12 January 1966: Standard registration
- BILSBORROW (GALLOWAY) CHARITY FOR THE SICK POOR (Previous name)
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Julie Patricia Flewitt | Trustee | 29 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Marion Flaherty | Trustee | 28 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
MRS BETTY SINGLETON | Trustee |
|
||||||
MISS D M BARTON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SHEILA TOMLINSON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.51k | £1.31k | £1.04k | £1.48k | £928 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.13k | £900 | £1.65k | £1.65k | £1.70k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 09 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 20 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 05 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 31 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 13 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 19 DECEMBER 1952 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME OF 7 MAY 1974 AND SECTION 74(2)(C) RESOLUTION OF 15 NOVEMBER 2006 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 24 NOVEMBER 2009
Charitable objects
CLEAR INCOME TO BE APPLIED IN RELIEVING IN CASES OF NEED PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE PARISHES OF MYERSCOUGH, BILSBORROW, BARTON AND WOODPLUMPTON IN THE LOCALITY OF CATFORTH AND THE CITY OF PRESTON WHO ARE SICK, CONVALESCENT, DISABLED, HANDICAPPED OR INFIRM BY PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR ITEMS, SERVICES OR FACILITIES WHICH ARE CALCULATED TO ALLEVIATE THE SUFFERING OR ASSIST THE RECOVERY OF SUCH PERSONS IN SUCH CASES BUT ARE NOT READILY AVAILABLE TO THEM FROM OTHER SOURCES.
Area of benefit
SEE OBJECTS
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 Willow Bank
Garstang Road
Bilsborrow
PRESTON
PR3 0RE
- Phone:
- 01995 640057
- Email:
- m-kirkham@outlook.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window