Accounts and annual returns MANSELL HUNT CATTY, CO LTD , EMPLOYEE BENEVOLENT FUND KNOWN AS THE (H S THROWER TRUST) (FOR NECESSITIOUS EMPLOYEES)

Charity number: 246206
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2012 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2012 Not submitted
Annual return 30 June 2011 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2011 Not submitted
Annual return 30 June 2010 18 July 2011 79 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2010 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2009 17 August 2010 109 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2009 Not Required