Financial history SIR THOMAS CREWE'S ALMSHOUSES

Charity number: 246208
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £21.60k £21.20k £21.32k £24.25k £31.84k
Total expenditure £8.22k £7.11k £12.58k £23.17k £7.44k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A