SIR THOMAS CREWE'S ALMSHOUSES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of four almshouses
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Northamptonshire
Governance
- 22 February 1966: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Richard Duncan | Trustee | 17 October 2019 |
|
|||||
Colin Anthony Harber | Trustee | 29 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Caryl Billingham MBE | Trustee | 06 October 2016 |
|
|||||
Colin Waldron | Trustee | 21 January 2016 |
|
|||||
Anthony Stewart Bagot-Webb | Trustee | 03 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
JOHN MARK VIDLER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £21.60k | £21.20k | £21.32k | £24.25k | £31.84k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.22k | £7.11k | £12.58k | £23.17k | £7.44k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 30 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 30 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 02 May 2024 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 27 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 27 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 30 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE 2ND JULY 1957 AS VARIED OR AFFECTED BY SCHEME DATED 14TH SEPTEMBER 1998
Charitable objects
ALMSHOUSES FOR POOR PERSONS OF GOOD CHARACTER WHO HAVE RESIDED IN THE BOROUGH OF BRACKLEY FOR NOT LESS THAN 2 YEARS PRIOR TO THEIR APPOINTMENT AS AN ALMSPERSON, PREFERENCE SHALL BE GIVEN TO WIDOWS WITH THE QUALIFICATIONS AS AFORESAID.
Area of benefit
BRACKLEY
Contact information
- Address:
-
43 WAYNFLETE AVENUE
BRACKLEY
NN13 6AG
- Phone:
- 07773258186
- Email:
- johnvidler1@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window