Accounts and annual returns COLCHESTER QUAKER HOUSING ASSOCIATION LIMITED

Charity number: 246218
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2008 17 November 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 19 November 2008 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2007 17 June 2008 138 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 08 April 2008 68 days late
Annual return 31 March 2006 05 January 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 16 January 2007 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2005 19 January 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 19 January 2006 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2004 05 January 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2004 05 January 2005 On Time