SOUTHGATE HOMEBOUND AND DISABLED ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide transport to monthly evening meetings with speakers/entertainers. Local outings. Summer garden party. Christmas lunch.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Enfield
Governance
- 10 February 1966: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR I D WOODALL | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Stuart Woodall | Trustee | 16 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
MRS D A PRATER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ROSEMARY GRACE WOODALL BA | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.30k | £369 | £406 | £3.16k | £2.05k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.74k | £31 | £1.14k | £1.91k | £2.52k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 02 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 May 2024 | 104 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 21 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 22 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 19 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
THE CONSTITUTION AND RULES OF THE SOCIETY AS AMENDED ON 27TH OCTOBER 1965 AND RESOLUTION PASSED 18TH MAY 1973
Charitable objects
FOR THE RELIEF OF HOUSEBOUND, AGED AND INFIRM PERSONS BY THE ORGANISING OF OUTINGS, SOCIALS AND TRIPS AND INDIVIDUAL ASSISTANCE THROUGH REGULAR VISITING.
Area of benefit
FORMER BOROUGH OF SOUTHGATE
Contact information
- Address:
-
21 Saffron Crescent
SAWBRIDGEWORTH
Hertfordshire
CM21 9FE
- Phone:
- 07740354665
- Email:
- stuwoodall84@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window