Financial history THE DUKE OF CORNWALL'S LIGHT INFANTRY FUND

Charity number: 246292
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £330 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £478 £2.75k £500 £0 £42
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A