Financial history THE ABBEYFIELD RYDE SOCIETY LIMITED

Charity Number: 246364
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £205.26k £198.72k £203.80k £213.42k £244.66k
Total expenditure £194.97k £190.05k £202.09k £211.07k £224.76k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.14k £2.91k N/A N/A