Financial history THE OFFENHAM COMMUNITY CHARITIES

Charity number: 246399
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £2.75k £2.05k £2.07k £1.58k £1.58k
Total expenditure £2.23k £1.19k £2.02k £1.42k £1.92k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A