Accounts and annual returns CHARITY OF ELIZABETH CASS

Charity number: 246490
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 27 October 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2015 29 October 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2014 08 September 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2014 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2013 31 October 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2013 Not Required