Financial history CHARITY OF ELIZABETH CASS

Charity number: 246490
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2012 31/12/2013 31/12/2014 31/12/2015 31/12/2016
Total gross income £70 £71 £70 £71 £0
Total expenditure £70 £0 £70 £71 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £0