ILLSTON TOWN LAND CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Financial assistance with Rates/Taxes for residents of Illston on the Hill
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Leicestershire
Governance
- 14 March 1966: Standard registration
- ILLSTON PARISH ESTATE (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ARTHUR DAVID PEASE | Chair | 19 May 2013 |
|
|
||||||
Andrew James Rees Mr | Trustee | 21 November 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Wendy Cooper Mrs | Trustee | 22 June 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Ian Lauder Professor | Trustee | 13 April 2021 |
|
|||||||
LOUISE TRACEY HEARD | Trustee | 25 April 2017 |
|
|
||||||
MR R C HILLIAR | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.60k | £7.35k | £6.64k | £9.95k | £12.23k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.96k | £7.15k | £6.49k | £8.85k | £11.35k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 23 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 09 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 18 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 27 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
AS GOVERNED BY SCHEME OF 18TH JUNE 2001
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CHARITY IS THE PROMOTION OF ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT, AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT, TO INCLUDE THE PROVISION OF GRANTS TO ALL THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT TOWARDS DEFRAYING THE COST OF THEIR COUNCIL TAX
Area of benefit
ILLSTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
7 Marriott Drive
Kibworth Harcourt
LEICESTER
LE8 0JX
- Phone:
- 07582332676
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window