HATFIELD AND DISTRICT AGE CONCERN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Operates Friendship House, a leisure centre serving the elderly in the Hatfield, Hertfordshire area and providing comfortable surroundings for socialising, morning coffee/tea and subsidised lunches five days a week.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 09 March 1966: Standard registration
- FRIENDSHIP HOUSE (Working name)
- HATFIELD AND DISTRICT OLD PEOPLES WELFARE COUNCIL (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
STEPHEN RUSSELL | Chair |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £116.20k | £21.81k | £828 | £516 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £98.98k | £56.18k | £850 | £202 | £138 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £30.48k | £15.48k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 24 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 February 2022 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 April 2021 | 88 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 29 April 2021 | 88 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MODEL CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 7TH MARCH 1966 AS AMENDED 30TH NOVEMBER 1988 AND 22ND APRIL 2002
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE WELFARE OF THE AGED IN ANY MANNER WHICH NOW IS OR HEREAFTER MAY BE DEEMED BY LAW TO BE CHARITABLE IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION AND OPERATION OF DAY CARE FACILITIES FOR ELDERLY PEOPLE
Area of benefit
HATFIELD RURAL DISTRICT AND PARISH OF COLNEY HEATH
Contact information
- Address:
-
HATFIELD & DISTRICT AGE CONCERN
FRIENDSHIP HOUSE
WELLFIELD CLOSE
HATFIELD
AL10 0BU
- Phone:
- 01707 268961
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window