Financial history THE BRITISH PHYCOLOGICAL SOCIETY

Charity number: 246707
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2019 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £47.15k £163.20k £87.78k £98.16k £125.93k
Total expenditure £61.31k £85.98k £71.57k £80.42k £89.49k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A