THE BRITISH PHYCOLOGICAL SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Society aims to advance education by the encouragement and pursuit of all aspects of the study of algae and to publish the results of this research in a journal. The Society assists young researchers and eligible persons/organisations in research, education and dissemination of information relating to Phycology.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
35 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 10 January 1982: Standard registration
No other names
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jane Purton | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Prof Saul Purton | Trustee | 05 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Nicola Slee | Trustee | 09 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Prof Jane Lewis | Trustee | 07 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Hilary Redden | Trustee | 10 January 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £47.15k | £163.20k | £87.78k | £98.16k | £125.93k | |
|
Total expenditure | £61.31k | £85.98k | £71.57k | £80.42k | £89.49k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 21 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 21 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 22 April 2021 | 266 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 22 April 2021 | 266 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AND RULES FIRST ADOPTED JULY 1952 AS AMENDED 4 JANUARY 1979. 6 JANUARY 1994, 4 JANUARY 1996, 4 JANUARY 2007 AND 4 JANUARY 2008. as amended on 08 Jan 2012 as amended on 08 Jan 2019
Charitable objects
THE AIMS OF THE SOCIETY SHALL BE TO ADVANCE RESEARCH AND EDUCATION BV THE ENCOURAGEMENT AND PURSUIT OF ALL ASPECTS OF THE STUDY OF ALGAE AND TO PUBLISH THE RESULTS OF THIS RESEARCH IN A JOURNAL, AND ALSO IN OTHER PUBLICATIONS WHICH SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME APPEAR DESIRABLE, PROVIDED THAT ALL PUBLICATIONS OF THE SOCIETY SHALL BE AVAILABLE TO THE GENERAL PUBLIC. IN FURTHERANCE OF THOSE AIMS, BUT NOT OTHERWISE, THE SOCIETY SHALL ALSO AIM TO INCREASE PUBLIC AWARENESS OF THE IMPORTANCE AND APPLICATIONS OF ALGAE, AND TO CONTRIBUTE TO PUBLIC DEBATE ON ISSUES INVOLVING ALGAE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Linked charities
- 10 January 1982 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
NATURAL HISTORY MUSEUM
CROMWELL ROAD
LONDON
SW7 5BD
- Phone:
- 02079425910
- Email:
- j.brodie@nhm.ac.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window