Linked charities CHARITIES ADMINISTERED I C W THE FORMER 3RD (MILITIA) BATTALION THE ROYAL HAMPSHIRE REGIMENT

Charity Number: 246749
Removed charity
Linked charities
Governing document
SCHEME OF 6 APRIL 1956 AS VARIED BY SCHEMS OF 17 NOVEMBER 1959 AND 26 OCTOBER 1981
Charitable objects
INCOME TO BE USED FIRSTLY TOWARD THE COST OF REPAIRING OR REPLACING ANY OF THE CHATTELS BELONGING TO THE CHARITY CONSISTING OF THE OFFICERS MESS CHALLS AND SUBJECT THERETO FOR EQUIVALENT PURPOSES IN RESPECT OF ANY OF THE REGULAR UNITS FOR THE TIME BEING OF THE REGIMENT OR ANY OF THE UNITS FOR THE TIME BEING IN THE TERRITORIAL ARMY; PROVIDED THAT IF AND IN SO FAR AS THE INCOME OF ANY YEAR IS NOT REQUIRED FOR THE PURPOSES AFORESAID; THE MANAGING TRUSTEES MAY APPLY OR CAUSE TO BE APPLIED THE SAME:- (I) IN ASSISTING PERSONS SERVING OR HAVING SERVED IN THE REGIMENT (AND ESPECIALLY IN THE FORMER 3RD (MILITIA) BATTALION THEREOF) AND THEIR DEPENDANTS BEING IN NEED OF ASSISTANCE; (II) IN PAYING SUBSCRIPTIONS OR MAKING DONATIONS TO HOSPITALS, HOMES AND INSTITUTIONS HAVING AMONGST THEIR OBJECTS THE SUCCOUR IN SICKNESS OR CONVALESCENCE OF OFFICERS OR MEN WHO ARE SERVING OR HAVE SERVED IN HER MAJESTY'S FORCES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
  • 09 February 1966 : Standard registration
  • 19 August 1997 : Removed
  • 19 August 1997 : Asset transfer out