Financial history OLIVETAN BENEDICTINE SISTERS, TURVEY ABBEY

Charity Number: 246754
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £399.26k £330.30k £374.53k £400.95k £442.70k
Total expenditure £259.06k £238.24k £251.30k £283.83k £6.78m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £14.98k N/A