OLIVETAN BENEDICTINE SISTERS, TURVEY ABBEY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity supports the religious and charitable works carried out by the members of the community and cares for those members throughout their lives with the charity. The charitable work includes: care of members; choral worship in a chapel for members of all faiths; hospitality and pastoral care to retreatants; and religious art in order to educate and to add beauty to worship
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Central Bedfordshire
Governance
- 29 March 1966: Standard registration
- 20 March 2025: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 20 March 2025: Funds transferred to 1202777 PRIORY OF OUR LADY OF PEACE CIO
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £399.26k | £330.30k | £374.53k | £400.95k | £442.70k | |
|
Total expenditure | £259.06k | £238.24k | £251.30k | £283.83k | £6.78m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £14.98k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 20 January 2025 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 07 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 07 December 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 20 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 20 September 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 09 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 09 September 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 25 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 25 August 2020 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 24 JAN 1996
Charitable objects
SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES WHICH ADVANCE THE RELIGIOUS AND OTHER CHARITABLE WORK FOR THE TIME BEING CARRIED ON BY OR UNDER THE DIRECTION OF SOCIETY AS THE TRUSTEES WITH THE APPROVAL OF THE SUPERIOR SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
UNRESTRICTED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window