SNAITH AND COWICK RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are able to help residents of Snaith & Cowick in times of need with a one off payment or in certain circumstances help with ongoing hardship
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- East Riding Of Yorkshire
Governance
- 22 February 1966: Standard registration
- 02 August 1995: Removed
- SNAITH & COWICK UNITED CHARITIES (Working name)
- UNITED CHARITIES OF ROBERT BALLARD AND OTHERS (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PETER HIBBS | Chair | 19 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
EILEEN HALL | Trustee | 14 October 2020 |
|
|||||
MEGAN HORSFALL | Trustee | 14 October 2020 |
|
|||||
Mark Punton | Trustee | 10 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN Thornton | Trustee | 12 February 2015 |
|
|||||
Margaret Kilner | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.80k | £1.20k | £1.27k | £4.69k | £1.86k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.41k | £799 | £820 | £1.17k | £572 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 04 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 27 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 17 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 13 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 17 APRIL 1985 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME OF 7 APRIL 1989. as amended on 30 May 2018
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE BENEFICIAL AREA WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS BY MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY OR PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR ITEMS, SERVICES OR FACILITES CALCULATED TO REDUCE THE NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS OF SUCH PERSONS.
Area of benefit
SNAITH AND COWICK
Linked charities
- 22 February 1966 : Standard registration
- 02 August 1995 : Removed
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Barn
Court Road
Snaith
GOOLE
DN14 9JL
- Phone:
- 01405861383
- Email:
- suethornton0@googlemail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window