Financial history NOTTINGHAM LIBERAL SYNAGOGUE

Charity number: 246773
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £222.16k £128.49k £155.34k £286.04k £189.51k
Total expenditure £196.23k £141.22k £157.22k £202.62k £198.18k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £1.89k £3.44k