NOTTINGHAM LIBERAL SYNAGOGUE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The object of the Congregation is the advancement of liberal and progressive Judaism through: a.) providing and maintaining a place of worship and spiritual leadership b.) Conducting service c.) provide religious education d.) prvide facilities for proselytes e.) to solemnise life cycle events f.) performing other social, religious and charitable activities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
Total income includes £3,441 from 1 government grant(s)
People

14 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Derbyshire
- Lincolnshire
- Nottingham City
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 28 February 1966: Standard registration
- NOTTINGHAM PROGRESSIVE JEWISH CONGREGATION (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Michael Leigh | Trustee | 18 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Bogod | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Peter Gordon | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Antony Joel Moss | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Elisheva Reeves | Trustee | 13 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Allyson Kingsley | Trustee | 13 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
JEFFREY ADAM BOOK | Trustee | 14 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Susan Jennifer King | Trustee | 15 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr Michael Jeffrey Harris | Trustee | 30 June 2016 |
|
|||||
PAULA SCOTT | Trustee | 31 October 2013 |
|
|||||
Naomi Raymonde Alison Posner | Trustee | 29 March 2012 |
|
|
||||
DAVID LIPMAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DANNY RUBINS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
NICK RUBINS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £222.16k | £128.49k | £155.34k | £286.04k | £189.51k | |
|
Total expenditure | £196.23k | £141.22k | £157.22k | £202.62k | £198.18k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £1.89k | £3.44k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 07 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 07 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 04 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 04 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 17 April 2023 | 168 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 December 2021
(These accounts |
17 April 2023 | 168 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 16 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 16 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 15/09/1965 AS AMENDED ON 27/04/1969 AS AMENDED ON 30/04/1972 AS AMENDED ON 20/03/1994 AS AMENDED ON 12/01/1995 AS AMENDED ON 23/04/1995 AS AMENDED ON 08/05/2005 AS AMENDED ON 29/04/2012 AS AMENDED ON 17/03/2013 AS AMENDED ON 06/12/2013 AS AMENDED ON 30 MAR 2014 AS AMENDED ON 17 APR 2016 as amended on 15 Apr 2018 as amended on 13 Sep 2020 as amended on 13 Sep 2020 as amended on 13 Sep 2020 as amended on 13 Sep 2020 as amended on 13 Sep 2020 as amended on 13 Sep 2020 as amended on 24 Apr 2022 as amended on 21 Apr 2024
Charitable objects
TO ACCORD WITH THE PRINCIPLES AND RULES FOR THE TIME BEING OF THE UNION OF LIBERAL AND PROGRESSIVE SYNAGOGUES
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Nottingham Liberal Synagogue
Lloyd Street
NOTTINGHAM
NG5 4BP
- Phone:
- 0115 962 4761
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window