Accounts and annual returns BRISTOL MAGISTRATES' COURT POOR BOX FUND

Charity number: 246811
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2007 25 March 2008 54 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2006 25 March 2008 146 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2006 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2005 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2004 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2004 Not Required