CHARITY LANDS

Charity number: 246818
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Trustees manage the land and then hold the proceeds on trust until required by the Wramplingham Parochial church council for repairs.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £1,000
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Other Finance
Where the charity operates:
  • Norfolk

Governance

Registration history:
  • 16 February 1966: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • WRAMPLINGHAM TOWN LANDS CHARITY (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Investment
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
PHILIP EDWARD RICHARDSON Trustee 09 May 2017
WYMONDHAM OLD GRAMMAR SCHOOL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
ROTARY CLUB OF WYMONDHAM TRUST FUND
Received: On time
WYMONDHAM MUSIC FESTIVAL
Received: On time
ROSALYN MARY VINCENT Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £1.40k £550 £600 £13.20k £1.00k
Total expenditure £985 £0 £0 £4.55k £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 13 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 25 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 19 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 11 January 2022 72 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 13 November 2020 13 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
1 Home Farm Cottages
Hall Lane
Wramplingham
WYMONDHAM
NR18 0RX
Phone:
07885617276
Website:

No information available