CROMPTON STAGE SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
An Amateur Theatre Society providing entertainment for the local community and theatre facilities for use by other touring Theatre groups, schools and societies.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

12 Trustee(s)
150 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- Lancashire
- Oldham
Governance
- 03 March 1966: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Barbara Micklethwaite M.B.E. | Chair | 12 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Barnes | Trustee | 22 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Clare Louise Bennett | Trustee | 22 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Peter Ludlam | Trustee | 22 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Peter Richard Rosebury | Trustee | 18 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Michelle Tweedie | Trustee | 18 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Jane Sharp | Trustee | 18 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
John Edward Tweedie | Trustee | 18 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Elaine Rosebury | Trustee | 18 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
JUDITH HAUGHTON B.E.M. | Trustee | 18 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
David John Liddell | Trustee | 18 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Steven Bennett | Trustee | 18 September 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £109.58k | £8.44k | £145.58k | £150.70k | £252.60k | |
|
Total expenditure | £109.60k | £26.88k | £157.21k | £129.93k | £219.95k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 13 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 13 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 27 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 August 2023
(These accounts |
27 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 06 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 06 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 09 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 12 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 12 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ADOPTED ON 14 JANUARY 1966 AS AMENDED 16 JUNE 1982
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION IN THE ARTS. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE (A) (B) (C) (D) (E) OF CLAUSE 2 OF RULES).
Area of benefit
CROMPTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
Crompton Stage Society
Playhouse2
2 Newtown Street
Shaw
OL2 8NX
- Phone:
- 01706 847281
- Email:
- finance@playhouse2.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window