Accounts and annual returns JOHN THEODORE WOOD CHARITY

Charity number: 246859
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2012 17 May 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2012 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2011 02 September 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2011 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2010 28 July 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2010 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2009 09 March 2010 37 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 Not Required