THE ROYAL HAMPSHIRE REGIMENT WELFARE FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To foster esprit de corps among former members of the Royal Hampshire Regiment enabling them to keep in touch with Regimental affairs and with each other. To assist Comrades to obtain suitable employment and to relieve them and/or their dependents, widows or children who are in need, hardship or distress. To produce a report upon the activities and deaths of comrades.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Armed Forces/emergency Service Efficiency
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 22 September 1962: Standard registration
- THE COMRADES ASSOCIATION (Working name)
- CHARITIES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE ROYAL HAMPSHIRE REGIMENT (Previous name)
- THE ROYAL HAMPSHIRE REGIMENT COMRADES ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- THE ROYAL HAMPSHIRE REGIMENT COMRADES ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Timothy Andrew Lepel Glass | Chair | 09 December 2021 |
|
|||||
Amy Stone | Trustee | 21 June 2023 |
|
|||||
Col Simon Aubrey Craycroft Frere-Cook MBE | Trustee | 09 December 2021 |
|
|||||
Lt Col Stuart Joseph Nye MBE | Trustee | 09 December 2021 |
|
|||||
Lieutenant Colonel Retired Christopher Frank Warren | Trustee | 09 December 2021 |
|
|||||
Col Paul Anthony Davis CBE | Trustee | 09 December 2021 |
|
|||||
John Michael Curtis | Trustee | 09 December 2021 |
|
|||||
Brigadier David Harrison MBE DL | Trustee | 09 December 2021 |
|
|||||
Matthew Fraser Pearce | Trustee | 09 December 2021 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.59k | £319.95k | £39.23k | £41.39k | £42.69k | |
|
Total expenditure | £78.48k | £124.64k | £89.33k | £44.13k | £84.17k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 11 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 11 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 21 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 21 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 20 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 03 JUN 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE: (1) TO PROMOTE THE EFFICIENCY OF THE SUCCESSOR REGIMENT BY FOSTERING ESPRIT DE CORPS AMONG MEMBERS AND ENABLING THEM TO KEEP IN TOUCH WITH REGIMENTAL AFFAIRS AND WITH ONE ANOTHER. (2) ASSISTING MEMBERS TO OBTAIN SUITABLE EMPLOYMENT. (3) TO RELIEVE ALL MEMBERS OF THE FORMER REGIMENT, AND FORMER AND SERVING MEMBERS OF THE SUCCESSOR REGIMENT WHO WERE DOMICILED IN HAMPSHIRE OR THE ISLE OF WIGHT AT THE TIME OF ENLISTMENT OR COMMISSIONING, OR THEIR DEPENDENTS, WHO ARE IN NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS. (4) THE TRUSTEES MAY RELIEVE PERSONS IN NEED BY: (A) MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY TO THEM; OR (B) PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR GOODS, SERVICES OR FACILITIES FOR THEM; OR (C) MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY TO OTHER PERSONS OR BODIES WHO PROVIDE GOODS, SERVICES OR FACILITIES TO THOSE IN NEED. (5) IF AND IN SO FAR AS THE INCOME OF THE CHARITY CANNOT BE APPLIED TOWARDS THE OBJECT SPECIFIED IN SUB-CLAUSES (1-3) ABOVE, THE TRUSTEES MAY APPLY IT FOR THE RELIEF OF THE FOLLOWING CATEGORIES OF PERSON WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS IN THE FOLLOWING ORDER OF PRIORITY: (A) SERVING OFFICERS AND EX-OFFICERS WHO PREVIOUSLY HAVE BEEN SECONDED OR ATTACHED TO THE FORMER REGIMENT AND THEIR DEPENDENTS; (B) OFFICERS AND EX-OFFICERS OF THE WESSEX REGIMENT WHO HAVE SERVED IN COMPANIES IN HAMPSHIRE OR THE ISLE OF WIGHT AND THEIR DEPENDENTS; (C) TERRITORIAL AND ARMY RESERVE OFFICERS AND FORMER TERRITORIAL AND ARMY RESERVE OFFICERS OF THE PRINCESS OF WALES'S ROYAL REGIMENT WHO HAVE SERVED IN TERRITORIAL AND ARMY RESERVE COMPANIES IN HAMPSHIRE AND THE ISLE OF WIGHT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Linked charities
- 22 September 1962 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
Royal Hampshire Regiment Museum
Serles House
Southgate Street
Winchester
SO23 9EG
- Phone:
- 01962863658
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window