CHARITY OF THOMAS STEVENS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Thomas Stevens, a gentleman farmer, owner of Parsonage Farm, Cobham died 1893 and the charity was founded under the provision of his will. A charitable trust bequeathed to the parish of Cuxton, Kent, for those who deserve benefit. Originally set up to provide bread or coals for the poor; now interpreted as food or fuel. Beneficiaries must live within Cuxton civil parish for the minimum of 2 years.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Medway
Governance
- 22 February 1966: Standard registration
- THOMAS STEVENS TRUST (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ian Alexander Gray | Trustee | 08 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Maureen Nora Vinnicombe | Trustee | 08 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
ROGER PAUL SAVAGE | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £87 | £1.22k | £644 | £242 | £553 | |
|
Total expenditure | £540 | £0 | £580 | £450 | £350 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 13 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 17 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 04 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 07 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
WILL PROVED IN THE PRINCIPAL PROBATE REGISTRY ON 9TH MARCH, 1893.
Charitable objects
TO PURCHASE BREAD AND COAL AND DISTRUBUTE IT TO THE POOR OF THE PARISH.
Area of benefit
CUXTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
196-198 Bush Road
Cuxton
ROCHESTER
Kent
ME2 1HE
- Phone:
- 01634716334
- Email:
- iangray@live.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window