THE ROYAL NAVY TROPHY FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

No information available
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
Governance
- 21 March 1966: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.91k | £25.97k | £24.33k | £41.40k | £44.93k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.35k | £5.25k | £15.13k | £6.98k | £10.40k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 23 April 2025 | 23 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 59 days | |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 01 July 2024 | 92 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 424 days | |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 01 July 2024 | 458 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 01 July 2024 | 823 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1155 days | |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 01 July 2024 | 1188 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE 12TH AUGUST 1985. SCHEME DATED 12 AUG 1985 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 11 NOV 2024
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE EFFICIENCY OF THE ROYAL NAVY AND UK ARMED FORCES, AND TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN THE HISTORY OF THE ARMED FORCES AND ARMED CONFLICT BY: (A) THE ESTABLISHMENT AND MAINTENANCE OF A COLLECTION OF ITEMS OF CULTURAL, SIGNIFICANT AND RENOWNED INTEREST TO THE ROYAL NAVY AND TO SELECTED NON-MILITARY ORGANISATIONS, FOR THE PROMOTION OF THE HISTORY AND FUTURE OF THE ROYAL NAVY AND DEFENCE ENGAGEMENT IN THE UK AND AROUND THE WORLD. (B) THE PRESERVATION, MAINTENANCE AND REPAIR OF ARTICLES OF HISTORIC INTEREST.
Contact information
- Address:
-
ROYAL NAVY TROPHY CENTRE
HM NAVAL BASE
20 STORE (BLDG 2/003) 2ND FLOOR
GLOUCESTER ROAD
PORTSMOUTH
PO1 3NJ
- Phone:
- 02392720305
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window