BERECHURCH AND BLACKHEATH VILLAGE HALL
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Essex
Governance
- 24 February 1966: Standard registration
- 17 August 2010: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2005 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE OF 25TH APRIL, 1935.
Charitable objects
VILLAGE HALL FOR PURPOSES CALCULATED TO PROMOTE THE MORAL, INTELLECTUAL OR PHYSICAL IMPROVEMENT OR WELFARE OR THE REASONABLE RECREATION OR BENEFIT OF THE PARISHIONERS OF BERECHURCH AND BLACKHEATH.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF BERECHURCH AND LOCALITY OF BLACKHEATH.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window