THE ALLOSTOCK, LOWER PEOVER AND PLUMLEY AID FUND

Charity Number: 246961
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Small grants to elderly people for the relief of poverty.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023

Total income: £247
Total expenditure: £211

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
  • Cheshire East
  • Cheshire West & Chester

Governance

Registration history:
  • 26 November 1974: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Father Murray Aldridge-Collins Trustee 16 July 2020
BUCKLOW SCHOOL CHARITY OF RICHARD CUMBERBACH AND HIS WIFE
Received: On time
GEORGE THOMAS DUTTON Trustee 30 September 2017
KNUTSFORD AND DISTRICT YOUNG FARMERS CLUB
Received: On time
Elizabeth Hall Trustee 17 November 2011
ALDERLEY EDGE AND KNUTSFORD METHODIST CIRCUIT
Received: On time
SYBIL MARY CROSSMAN Trustee
PLUMLEY VILLAGE HALL
Received: On time
BUCKLOW SCHOOL CHARITY OF RICHARD CUMBERBACH AND HIS WIFE
Received: On time
Norman Eric WITHENSHAW Trustee
BUCKLOW SCHOOL CHARITY OF RICHARD CUMBERBACH AND HIS WIFE
Received: On time
PAMELA ADLINGTON Trustee
WOMEN'S INSTITUTE - LOWER PEOVER
Received: On time
VILLAGE HALL
Received: On time
JULIA WILSON Trustee
BUCKLOW SCHOOL CHARITY OF RICHARD CUMBERBACH AND HIS WIFE
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023
Total gross income £107 £108 £363 £178 £247
Total expenditure £84 £103 £104 £217 £211
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2023 22 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2022 16 March 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2021 18 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2020 26 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 16 July 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
TABLEY BROOK COTTAGE
PICKMERE LANE
PICKMERE
KNUTSFORD
WA16 0HS
Phone:
07771651888
Website:

No information available