FUEL ALLOTMENT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
RENT FROM A NATURE RESERVE ( KNOW AS LOLLY MORE ) PLUS RENTS FROM THREE INDIVIDUAL ALLOTMENTS ANNUALLY.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Norfolk
Governance
- 01 March 1966: Standard registration
- WESTFIELD ALLOTMENT (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
REV DR Timothy Weatherstone | Chair | 29 October 2015 |
|
|||||
TINA WATTS | Trustee | 29 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
PAUL WATTS | Trustee | 29 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT HADDEN PHILO | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JEREMY PAUL RICHES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANGELA BARNES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £130 | £125 | £120 | £465 | £469 | |
|
Total expenditure | £100 | £130 | £150 | £0 | £525 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 03 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 23 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 02 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 17 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 24 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
P.R.29. PT I P.823.
Charitable objects
FUEL FOR THE POOR INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH.
Area of benefit
THE PARISH OF WESTFIELD.
Contact information
- Address:
-
GREENWOOD FARM
DEREHAM ROAD
WESTFIELD
DEREHAM
NR19 1QF
- Phone:
- 01362698100
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window