FISONS CHARITY TRUST
Charity number: 247009
Removed charity
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
What the charity does:
No information available
Who the charity helps:
No information available
How the charity helps:
No information available
Where the charity operates:
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
Registration history:
- 13 May 1986: Standard registration
- 16 September 2009: Removed (Does not operate)
Organisation type:
Other names:
No other names
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available
Financial history
No financial information provided for the past 5 financial periods
Accounts and annual returns
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2004 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2004 | Not submitted |
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 1 FEBRUARY 1966
Charitable objects
TO PAY OR APPLY ALL MONEYS RECEIVED UNDER DEEDS OF COVENANT AND BY WAY OF REFUND OF TAX TO SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSE OR PURPOSES WHICH IT IS WITHIN THE POWER OF FISONS PLC TO DEVOTE ITS FUNDS.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED
Linked charities
Linked charities
Governing document
SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 14 MARCH 1986
Charitable objects
TO ESTABLISH A VISITING PROFESSORSHIP AT THE INSTITUTE OF CHILD HEALTH LONDON TO ENABLE IN EACH YEAR A DISTINGUISHED MEDICAL OR NON-MEDICAL SCIENTIST IN A FIELD ALLIED TO PAEDIATRICS TO SPEND A PERIOD OF TIME ATTACHED TO A DEPARTMENT OF THE INSTITUTE TO A DEPARTMENT OF THE INSTITUTE IN THE UNITED KINGDOM.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
- 13 May 1986 : Standard registration
- 16 September 2009 : Removed
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window