Financial history NORTH WESTERN REFORM SYNAGOGUE

Charity Number: 247081
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £2.18m £842.58k £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £1.86m £740.81k £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £96.36k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £1.79m £661.29k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £367.85k £171.61k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Investment £20.92k £9.69k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other £9.69k £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £581.74k £661.29k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.72m £685.13k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £15.37k £5.15k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £8.50k £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £9.26k £4.97k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £124.25k £50.53k N/A N/A N/A