THE GOODLY DALE COTTAGE HOMES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The purpose of the Goodly Dale Cottage Homes is "to provide accomodation for poor persons of good character each of whom shall not be less than 60 years of age (or 50 if disabled), and shall have been born or lived for 10 of the last 30 years in Windermere and Ambleside Urban Districts, Undermillbeck, Troutbeck and Applethwaite.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 06 February 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Cumbria
Governance
- 09 March 1966: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mr Bill Smith | Chair |
|
||||||
Mr Will Clark | Trustee | 17 August 2017 |
|
|||||
Mr Bob Pow | Trustee | 28 July 2016 |
|
|||||
JOHN BRUCE PARKER | Trustee | 28 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH LIDIARD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 06/02/2020 | 06/02/2021 | 06/02/2022 | 06/02/2023 | 06/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £81.73k | £82.15k | £85.36k | £89.81k | £95.78k | |
|
Total expenditure | £82.58k | £78.13k | £86.07k | £113.81k | £85.19k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.50k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 06 February 2024 | 21 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 February 2024 | 21 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 06 February 2023 | 15 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 February 2023 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 06 February 2022 | 21 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 February 2022 | 25 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 06 February 2021 | 02 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 February 2021 | 06 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 06 February 2020 | 07 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 February 2020 | 24 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE 14 OCTOBER 1970 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 03 JUL 2017
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION OF ALSMHOUSES FOR POOR MARRIED COUPLES, WIDOWS OR SPINSTERS OF GOOD CHARACTER EACH OF WHOM:- A) AT THE TIME OF APPOINTMENT SHALL BE NOT LESS THAN 60 YEARS OF AGE OR NOT LESS THAN 50 YEARS OF AGE WHERE DISABLED BY ACCIDENT OR INFIRMITY FROM MAINTAINING HIMSELF OR HERSELF B) SHALL HAVE BEEN BORN IN THE AREA OF THE URBAN DISTRICTS OF WINDERMERE AND AMBLESIDE OR THE FORMER TOWNSHIPS OF UNDERMILLBECK, TROUTBECK AND APPLETHWAITE OR SHALL HAVE LIVED IN THE SAID AREA FOR A TOTAL OF 20 YEARS DURING THE 30 YEARS IMMEDIATELY PRECEDING THE TIME OF APPOINTMENT.
Area of benefit
SEE OBJECTS
Linked charities
- 09 March 1966 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
14 Goodly Dale
WINDERMERE
LA23 2JB
- Phone:
- 01539448363
- Email:
- pow246@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window