Trustees BOVINGDON GREEN VILLAGE HALL
Charity Number: 247129

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ashley Bristow | Trustee | 07 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jan Lundie | Trustee | 07 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jay Patel | Trustee | 07 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Susan White | Trustee | 14 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jessie Passaway | Trustee | 10 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rob Passaway | Trustee | 10 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
John Gillbe | Trustee | 10 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
John Johnny | Trustee | 14 April 2005 |
|
|
||||
AUDREY PLATT | Trustee | 07 April 1981 |
|
|
||||
JOHN APPLETON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS SUE PLATT | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.