Financial history LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF COSSHAM HOSPITAL

Charity number: 247142
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £21.81k £0 £3.07k £9.14k £24.70k
Total expenditure £44.72k £0 £2.95k £19.25k £24.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A