Trustees LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF COSSHAM HOSPITAL
Charity number: 247142

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Margaret Nolder | Chair | 11 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Shirley Eaves | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Helen Day | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Irene Draper | Trustee | 08 April 2022 |
|
|||||
Christopher Patch | Trustee | 22 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Pat Patch | Trustee | 22 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Patsy-Anne Stevens | Trustee | 11 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Marion Meachin Derrick | Trustee | 06 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Charlotte James | Trustee | 01 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
Ann Elizabeth Smith | Trustee | 01 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
Gloria Maureen Moore | Trustee | 27 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
EILEEN MAY SAVAGE | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.