THE GORSUCH, LANGLEY AND PRYNCE CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity helps people in need who live within the parishes of the Holy Cross (the Abbey) and St Giles.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Shropshire
Governance
- 16 March 1966: Standard registration
- PETER LANGLEY (Previous name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KENNETH MICHAEL VINE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Dr Rosemary Dartnall | Trustee | 15 September 2021 |
|
|||||
Mary Davies | Trustee | 15 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rev Tom David Atfield | Trustee | 25 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rev Andrew knight | Trustee | 19 November 2014 |
|
|||||
CHRIS HUSS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DIANA JANE MORGAN | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £45.29k | £44.98k | £46.79k | £48.70k | £51.34k | |
|
Total expenditure | £30.85k | £80.27k | £40.53k | £52.77k | £53.71k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 20 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 20 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 17 May 2024 | 199 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 17 May 2024 | 199 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 14 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 14 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 20 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 20 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 13 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 13 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
WILL OF 8 APRIL 1650 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 26 JUNE 2000
Charitable objects
FOR THE RELIEF OF PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT WHO ARE IN NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS
Area of benefit
THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISHES OF HOLY CROSS (THE ABBEY) AND ST GILES
Linked charities
- 16 March 1966 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
116 UNDERDALE ROAD
SHREWSBURY
SY2 5EF
- Phone:
- 07986 480982
- Email:
- pamshrew@aol.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window