Governing document Pevensey Community Support
Charity number: 247247

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 26/02/1960 AS AMENDED ON 21/09/1976 AS AMENDED ON 08/09/1993 AS AMENDED ON 02/06/1999 AS AMENDED ON 06/09/2011 as amended on 17 Jan 2017 as amended on 31 Jul 2018
Charitable objects
To promote the welfare of the Community in any manner which now is or hereafter may be deemed by law to be charitable to the community within the Parish of Pevensey.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
PEVENSEY
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.