THE ABBEYFIELD KNUTSFORD SOCIETY LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of accommodation for lonely and elderly people in accordance with the aims and principles of the national Abbeyfield Society
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Cheshire East
Governance
- 15 March 1966: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Colin Harvey | Trustee | 27 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Ailsa Parry | Trustee | 27 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Leyland | Trustee | 27 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lawrence Tilley | Trustee | 27 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Gail Leicester | Trustee | 19 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Simon Noblet | Trustee | 19 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Susan Lunney | Trustee | 03 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Stewart Fraser | Trustee | 26 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT STEPHENS | Trustee | 28 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
ANDREA JANE CARTMEL | Trustee | 03 October 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £123.32k | £131.46k | £142.97k | £218.70k | £175.90k | |
|
Total expenditure | £122.99k | £125.89k | £144.49k | £146.27k | £254.22k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 10 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 10 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 21 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 21 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 13 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 13 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 16 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 16 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 01 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 01 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION DATED 31ST MAY 1965
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE AGED, IMPOTENT AND POOR PEOPLE OF ALL CLASSES.... FOR LONELY NEGLECTED OLD OR HANDICAPPED PEOPLE. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 3 OF MEMORANDUM)
Area of benefit
KNUTSFORD AND ELSEWHERE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Abbeyfield House
23c Bexton Road
Knutsford
WA16 0EE
- Phone:
- 01565632719
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window