Accounts and annual returns SAINT LEONARD'S HOUSE (SWANSEA AND WEST WALES) TRUST

Charity Number: 247367
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2005 28 November 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 29 November 2005 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2004 06 May 2005 95 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2004 10 February 2005 10 days late