BATTERSEA UNITED CHARITIES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advancement of education for the benefit of persons in need of financial assistance who reside in, or attend an educational establishment in, the former Metropolitan Borough of Battersea; and the relief of poverty of persons who are resident in the former Metropolitan Borough of Battersea, in particular but not exclusively by the payment of pensions or the provision of other financial support
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Wandsworth
Governance
- 04 April 1966: Standard registration
- 11 June 2018: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
- BATTERSEA UNITED CHARITIES - THE NON-APPRENTICING CHARITIES (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PHILIP WILLIAM BEDDOWS | Chair | 27 February 2004 |
|
|
||||
Alexander John Read | Trustee | 04 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Claire Jean Phipps FCA | Trustee | 04 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
George Ian Henry Hope Henderson | Trustee | 18 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Marie Hanson MBE | Trustee | 12 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kate Sutcliffe | Trustee | 07 July 2014 |
|
|
||||
CAROLINE USHER | Trustee | 01 January 2011 |
|
|
||||
COUNCILLOR TONY BELTON | Trustee | 01 January 2011 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN ALAN WILLMETT | Trustee | 25 January 2008 |
|
|
||||
TESSA MARY EDWINA STRICKLAND | Trustee | 18 September 2005 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £22.93k | £32.19k | £32.59k | £23.33k | £14.87k | |
|
Total expenditure | £23.72k | £25.24k | £34.32k | £26.16k | £16.82k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 17 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 19 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 12 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 12 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 29 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 29 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 17 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 13 DEC 1938 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 24 JUN 2018
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF PERSONS WHO ARE IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE AND ARE RESIDENT IN, OR ATTEND AN EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENT IN, THE FORMER METROPOLITAN BOROUGH OF BATTERSEA. THE RELIEF OF POVERTY OF PERSONS WHO ARE RESIDENT IN THE FORMER METROPOLITAN BOROUGH OF BATTERSEA, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PAYMENT OF PENSIONS OR THE PROVISION OF OTHER FINANCIAL SUPPORT.
Area of benefit
THE FORMER METROPOLITAN BOROUGH OF BATTERSEA.
Linked charities
- ANN COOPER
- ANTHONY FRANCIS HALDIMAND
- ARTHUR SYKES
- BATTERSEA LAMMAS HALL
- CHARITY OF CHARLES BARRINGTON
- EDWARD DAGNALL
- ELY CHARITY FOUNDED BY ASHLEY WILLIAM GRAHAM ALLEN
- HENRY JUER
- HENRY SMITH (BATTERSEA SHARE)
- JOHN CHARLES CONSTABLE
- JOHN EDMONDS
- JOHN PARVIN
- JOHN RAPP
- PETTAUGH CENTRE ASSOCIATION
- REBECCA WOOD
- THE CHARLOTTE DESPARD CHARITY
- THOMAS ASHNESS
- 04 April 1966 : Standard registration
- 11 June 2018 : Removed
Contact information
- Address:
-
Battersea United Charities
Battersea Library
265 Lavender Hill
London
SW11 1JB
- Phone:
- 07813668897
- Email:
- batterseacharities@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window