Financial history GERMAN SOCIETY OF BENEVOLENCE

Charity number: 247379
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/11/2020 30/11/2021 30/11/2022 30/11/2023 30/11/2024
Total gross income £14.22k £14.27k £14.70k £14.82k £14.74k
Total expenditure £7.90k £7.80k £9.00k £8.92k £9.74k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A