Accounts and annual returns JOHN STEPHENSON (FOR KNARESDALE SHARE)

Charity number: 247384
Charity reporting is overdue by 98 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 98 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 98 days
Annual return 31 March 2023 12 August 2024 194 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 30 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 30 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 30 January 2022 364 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required