THE SUSSEX ASSOCIATION FOR SPINA BIFIDA AND HYDROCEPHALUS

Charity number: 247430
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Recently incorporated new reg'd No:1175032 Working with those in Sussex who have spina bifida and/or hydrocephalus to create and develop their best opportunities. Activities include and Adviser service, one stop clinic, family support work, buddy scheme, residential breaks, education advice, youth clubs, newsletter, website, training and work experience opportunities.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
  • Accommodation/housing
  • Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
Where the charity operates:
  • East Sussex
  • West Sussex

Governance

Registration history:
  • 31 March 1966: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • S A S B A H (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Hilary Lewis Trustee 28 November 2019
THE SUSSEX ASSOCIATION FOR SPINA BIFIDA AND HYDROCEPHALUS
Received: On time
EAST SUSSEX FEDERATION OF WOMEN'S INSTITUTES
Received: 53 days late
Matt WEST Trustee 22 January 2019
None on record

Financial history

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 26 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 26 September 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 01 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 30 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 28 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
UNITS 5 & 6
SWAN WOOD PARK
GUN HILL
HORAM
EAST SUSSEX
TN21 OLL
Phone:
01825873045