Accounts and annual returns CHELSEA OPERA GROUP TRUST

Charity number: 247438
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2024 07 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2024 01 April 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2023 03 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 03 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2022 14 March 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 14 March 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2021 01 February 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2020 19 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 05 February 2021 On Time Download Open in new window