CHELSEA OPERA GROUP TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The primary object of the Chelsea Opera Group Trust is "the advancement of musical education in general and in particular by sponsoring managing and providing financial assistance for performances of operatic or other musical works..."The Trust makes grants to the Chelsea Opera group in furtherance of the primary object.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 29 March 1966: Standard registration
- C O G (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Carolyn Ashford-Russell | Chair | 19 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT WILLIAM MONTGOMERY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CHRISTOPHER KEY PATEY MBE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £52.13k | £17.90k | £28.63k | £27.03k | £30.06k | |
|
Total expenditure | £42.28k | £7.33k | £35.62k | £43.61k | £18.43k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 07 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | 01 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 03 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 03 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 14 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 14 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 01 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 19 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 05 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEEDS DATED 2 APRIL AND 17 SEPTEMBER 1963
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF MUSICAL EDUCATION IN GENERAL AND IN PARTICULAR BY SPONSORING, MANAGING AND PROVIDING FINANCIAL OR OTHER ASSISTANCE FOR PERFORMANCES OF OPERATIC AND OTHER MUSICAL WORKS AT THE UNIVERSITIES OF OXFORD AND CAMBRIDGE, ETON COLLEGE, WINCHESTER COLLEGE AND ELSEWHERE AND BY PROVIDING OPPORTUNITIES IN SUCH PERFORMANCES FOR CONDUCTORS, SINGERS AND INSTRUMENTALISTS TO OBTAIN VALUABLE EXPERIENCE.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Linton House
43 Bargate
Richmond
North Yorkshire
DL10 4QY
- Phone:
- 07747777156
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window